+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0550)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 550 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB407ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10105270D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB407EH1
- Amendment by Delegate Oder agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105270D-H1
- Read second time
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10105270D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103799D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor