+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB407ER)
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB407H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 065179260-H1
- Read second time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: General Government and Technology (Wardrup)
On January 25, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read second time
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 065179260-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1 (Orrock)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065146260
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (23-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor