+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102760D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice