+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB404ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB404H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106285D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106285D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101617D