+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
On April 9, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 26, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB404ER)
On March 4, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD3975112 (HB404E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed