+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB402ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Special on Proposed Mental Health Legislation
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 080222528-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB402E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080222528
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor