+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 2 (effective 2/5/16)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 9, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/2/16
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB402ER)
- Enrolled
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/16 16100469D
+ − Votes (4)
January 29, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (96-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2016: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor