+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (52-Y 47-N)
- VOTE: (52-Y 47-N)
- House sustained Governor's veto
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB402ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 1-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 3-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Phillips, Thomas, Parrish
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (6-Y 91-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 91-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senators: Miller, K.G., Trumbo, Howell
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 3-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 3-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981754400-E
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 2-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 981754400
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (11)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (52-Y 47-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (39-Y 1-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 3-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 91-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (36-Y 3-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 3-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Claims with amendments (14-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor