+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in Finance (14-Y 2-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 002839632-H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 002839632-H1
- Read second time
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 002839632-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 13, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 002180264
+ − Votes (3)
February 29, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Finance (14-Y 2-N)
February 18, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 2-N 1-A)
February 15, 2000: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor