+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 7/1/20)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB400ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 20100616D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB400E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Social Services
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 2, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100616D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2020: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2020: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark L. Keam
Type:
Primary Sponsor