+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0595)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 595 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB397ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (73-Y 25-N)
- Passed House (73-Y 25-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N)
- Read third time and passed House (74-Y 23-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101830D
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2018: Passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (73-Y 25-N)
February 1, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 23-N)
January 26, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (16-Y 5-N)
January 23, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor