+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Subject matter referred by letter to the Division of Motor Vehicles pursuant to Senate Rule 20(L)
- Continued to 2011 in Transportation (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
- Committee amendments
On January 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N)
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103480D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2010: Continued to 2011 in Transportation (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
January 28, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N)
January 19, 2010: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor