+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0013)
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 13 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB392ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 081670444-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB392E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resource
On January 4, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081670444
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor