+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Transportation
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101070D
+ − Vote
January 19, 2016: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor