+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 80 (effective 7/1/96)
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB392ER)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 960649364-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 960649364-H1
- Read second time
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 960649364-H1
On January 16, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 961476845
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor