+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Incorporated by Tra. (HB385-Wardrup) (14-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 028080972-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 028080972-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 028080972-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 026017972
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2002: Incorporated by Tra. (HB385-Wardrup) (14-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2002: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor