+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 4, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Labor and Commerce
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On January 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Referred from General Laws by voice vote
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100347D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsor
Ibraheem S. Samirah
Type:
Primary Sponsor