+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 1, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0679)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 679 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB386ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (37-Y 3-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for Pending question agreed to
- Senate amendments accepted by conference committee
- Pending question ordered
- Conference report agreed to by House (56-Y 34-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (56-Y 34-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (35-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendment rejected by House (39-Y 59-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (39-Y 59-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on amendment (35-Y 2-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Delegates: Hamilton, Jones, J.C., Behm
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Marye, Bolling, Potts
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #3 by Sen. Quayle withdrawn
- Amendment #1 by Sen. Quayle withdrawn
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment #2 by Sen. Quayle rejected
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 981593264-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 981593264-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (24-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 981593264-H1
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 981475264
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (37-Y 3-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (56-Y 34-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (39-Y 59-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (35-Y 2-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (37-Y 2-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amd. (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from General Laws with sub. (24-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor