+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0079)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 79 (effective 7/1/10)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB385ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10101670D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB385E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101670D