+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 8, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1041)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB383ER2)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (36-Y 2-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (36-Y 2-N)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Title Amended
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1041 (effective 7/1/00)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB383ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (57-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to (26-Y 13-N) 001923836-S1
- VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE (26-Y 13-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Edwards rejected (18-Y 22-N)
- Substitute by Sen. Marsh void 001929460-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 001923836-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (18-Y 22-N)
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 001923836-S1
On March 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 001774836-H1
- Read second time
- Communicated to Senate
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 001774836-H1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 001774836-H1
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub (29-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 2-N)
On January 18, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 001712216
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPT GOV.'S RECOMM. (36-Y 2-N)
April 19, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (57-Y 1-N)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE (26-Y 13-N)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 4-N)
March 8, 2000: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (18-Y 22-N)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 5, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (10-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 11, 2000: Reported from Appropriations with sub (29-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2000: Reported from C. J. with substitute (21-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor