+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB382ER)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 060895520-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB382E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: #2 FOIA/Procurement (Marshall, D.)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060895520
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2006: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor