+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 233 (effective 7/1/12)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB381ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101716D
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor