+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 17, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB381ER)
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB381H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064767520-H1
- Read second time
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 064767520-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 060897520
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor