+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
On April 9, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB38ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981660468-E
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/22/97 981660468
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (23-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1998: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor