+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/94)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 17, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB378ER)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to L. & C. sub-committee: 2
On January 21, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented and ordered printed