+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 197 (effective 1/1/99)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB378ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 980766845
- Referred to Committee on Finance