+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
On March 22, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB375ER)
On February 18, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On January 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (83-Y 11-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 15, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (17-Y 5-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/02 020150616