+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0757)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB375ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 29-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (65-Y 29-N)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 757 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB375ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (71-Y 27-N)
- Conference substitute printed 12105999D-H1
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Pogge, Merricks, Kory
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stanley, Reeves, Garrett
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 97-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB375S2
- Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 12105585D-S2 (25-Y 15-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 12105585D-S2 (Norment)
- Committee substitute rejected 12105517D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105517D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 25-N)
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12100430D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB375E
- Amendments by Delegate Pogge agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #1
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100430D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (15)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (26-Y 12-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 29-N)
March 8, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 13-N)
March 8, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N)
March 1, 2012: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N)
February 23, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N)
February 23, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (25-Y 15-N)
February 23, 2012: Substitute by Senator Norment agreed to 12105585D-S2 (25-Y 15-N)
February 23, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
February 2, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N)
January 27, 2012: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (16-Y 5-N)
January 26, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor