+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB374ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #1
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101597D
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2014: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor