+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
- Enacted, Chapter 781 (effective - see bill)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB373ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB373ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101784D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor