+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB373ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 987594324-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (28-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendments (5-Y 4-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987594324
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (17-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (28-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1998: Reported from Claims with amendments (5-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor