+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (59)
On May 26, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0900)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 900 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (30-Y 67-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (30-Y 67-N)
- Communicated to Governor
On April 20, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 986902811-H1
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed 986861718-S2 (Sen. Forbes & Mims)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB372ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (20-Y 73-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (20-Y 73-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate receded from substitute (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: RECEDE FROM SUBSTITUTE R (36-Y 3-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Motion to strike from Senate calendar rejected (16-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (16-Y 24-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute #1 by Sen. Forbes/Mims withdrawn 986861718
- Reading of substitute #2 waived
- Chair rules substitute #2 is germane
- Sub.#2 by Sen. Forbes/Mims agd. to (20-Y 20-N)985463657-S1
- VOTE: FLOOR SUB MIMS (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes yea
- Floor substitute printed 985463657-S1 ( Forbes and Mims)
- Amendment by Sen. Saslaw withdrawn
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985463657-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (20-Y 19-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983136809
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (30-Y 67-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: RECEDE FROM SUBSTITUTE R (36-Y 3-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (20-Y 73-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (16-Y 24-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (20-Y 19-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUB MIMS (20-Y 20-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor