+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 777 (effective 1/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB371ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (91-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 6-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Robinson, Gilbert, Herring
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Sturtevant, Dunnavant, Dance
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute rejected by House 18107610D-S1 (6-Y 90-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (6-Y 90-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107610D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB371S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107610D-S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 18106422D-H2 (Watts)
- Read second time
- Substitute by Delegate Watts out of order 18106422D-H2
- Committee substitute agreed to (50-Y 49-N) 18106017D-H1
- VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 49-N)
- Amendment #1 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N)
- Amendment #2 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N)
- Amendment #3 by Delegate Watts passed by (50-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: PASS BY (50-Y 49-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB371H1
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106017D-H1
- Substitute bill reprinted 18106017D-H1
- Incorporates HB1057 (Watts)
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101327D
- Referred to Committee on Rules