+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
On April 6, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB371ER)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1994: Reported from Transportation w/amds. (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1994: Reported from R. & I. N. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor