+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2006 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 68-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 68-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB370ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (29-Y 11-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067067264
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 68-N)
February 24, 2006: VOTE: (29-Y 11-N)
February 23, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor