+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB369ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 988839114-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988839114-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988839114-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (27-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988817114
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations