+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0563)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 563 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB369ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105185D-S1 (98-Y 1-N)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB369S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14105185D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14105185D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB369H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104228D-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104228D-H1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102389D
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor