+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB365ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB365ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB365E
- Printed as engrossed 18103580D-E
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 5, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103580D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (10)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 18, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor