+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (41-Y 59-N)
- Read third time and defeated by House (41-Y 59-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Criminal Law
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 067024264
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: DEFEATED (41-Y 59-N)
February 10, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor