+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 7/1/06)
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB36ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 063383524-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB36E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On December 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 063383524
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2006: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor