+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Substitute by Senator Stosch agreed to 069248824-S1 (23-Y 15-N)
- Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments rejected
- Floor substitute printed 069248824-S1 (Stosch)
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (23-Y 15-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N)
- VOTE: (24-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 15-N)
- VOTE: (23-Y 15-N)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Speaker ruled Senate substitute not germane
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill not properly before the Senate - returned to House
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB358S1
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 066033316-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB358E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #3 (Ware, R.L.)
On January 6, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 066033316
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (23-Y 15-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (24-Y 14-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (23-Y 15-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor