+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 200 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB358ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 1-N)
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103144D
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 1-N)
January 14, 2014: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor