+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/14)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
- VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (27-Y 70-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB354ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100089D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: REJECTED (27-Y 70-N)
March 5, 2014: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2014: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor