+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0118)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 118 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB352ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB352ER)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 988845468-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988845468-H1
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988845468-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982059468
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1998: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (29-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor