+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0495)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 495 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB349ER)
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Stosch, Saslaw
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Cox, M.K., Peace, Dance
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 12105655D-S1 (1-Y 93-N)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB349S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105655D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105655D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101497D