+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 5, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 1999 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB346ER)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsider constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982893376-E
On January 25, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 982893376
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
On November 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (20-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 982893376
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (11)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1999: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (30-Y 0-N)
November 23, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (22-Y 1-N)
February 14, 1998: Continued to 1999 in Courts of Justice (20-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor