+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
On April 12, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 1/14/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB345ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 981318368
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (95-Y 2-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor