+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (58)
On March 30, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB345ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 1-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 11-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 96-N)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Senate insisted on amendment (32-Y 7-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Stolle, Knight, Hayes
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate Rules Committee Chairman
- Senators: Stuart, Lewis, Chafin
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106911D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB345H1
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106911D-H1
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100865D
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (13)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 1-N)
March 9, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 1-N)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 7-N)
March 8, 2018: Senate insisted on amendment (32-Y 7-N)
March 8, 2018: Passed Senate with amendment (28-Y 11-N)
March 8, 2018: Rules suspended (37-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
March 1, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
February 26, 2018: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor