+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB344ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107473D-S1 (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107473D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB344S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107473D-S1
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18105668D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Toscano withdrawn 18106245D-H2
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB344H1
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 18106245D-H2 (Toscano)
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18105668D-H1
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100379D
- Referred to Committee on Education