+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 20, 2002 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 024879604-H1
- Amendment by Del. Woodrum agreed to
- Engrossed by House - com sub w/adm 024879604-EH1
- Printed as engrossed 024879604-EH1
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 024879604-H1
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/02 021140604
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2002: Passed by indefinitely in C. J. (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
February 1, 2002: Reported from C. J. with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor